Black v. Hino Motors
Plaintiff: Xavier Black
Defendant: Hino Motors
Case Number: 2:2021cv00139
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Hino Motors. Mailed to Plaintiff for service. (kdr)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons and mail them to Plaintiff for service; advising Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss this action unless proof of service is filed on or before Thursday, 1/20/2022, or Plaintiff establishes good cause for the failure to serve summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint; and directing Plaintiff's attention to the fact that he is required to be familiar and comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules on this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/25/2021. (kdr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Hino Motors filed by Xavier Black. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084192.) Summons not issued. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Hino Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hino Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?