Griffin River Terminal Inc v. Terral Riverservice Inc
Plaintiff: Griffin River Terminal Inc
Defendant: Terral Riverservice Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00141
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/7/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/22/2022; Proposed Bench Trial scheduled for sometime during the week of 5/15/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/30/2021. (ljb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Terral Riverservice Inc.(Harrison, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent B. Ryan on behalf of Griffin River Terminal Inc (Ryan, Kent)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Griffin River Terminal Inc. Terral Riverservice Inc served on 10/29/2021. (Ballard, J.)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice by Kent B. Ryan for plaintiff Griffin River Terminal Inc. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/5/2021. (ljb)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kent B. Ryan. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4138022. Filed by Griffin River Terminal Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ballard, J.)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terral Riverservice Inc, filed by Griffin River Terminal Inc. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084193. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
October 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Terral Riverservice Inc. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin River Terminal Inc v. Terral Riverservice Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griffin River Terminal Inc
Represented By: Carl John Marshall
Represented By: J. Grant Ballard
Represented By: Kent B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terral Riverservice Inc
Represented By: Michael McCarty Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?