Morris v. Yates
Plaintiff: James Morris
Defendant: Yates
Case Number: 2:2021cv00145
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by mail. The respondent will file a response to the petition within 21 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/2/2021. (ldb)
November 26, 2021 Filing 4 Filing Fee Received: $5.00, Receipt Number LIT084625. (jap)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or file a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis no later than December 02, 2021. Failure to timely comply with this Order could result in dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5. The Clerk is directed to forward Petitioner an IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/02/2021. (get)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite 2241 Review by James Morris. (kdr)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Morris.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?