Hammonds et al v. Thind et al
Plaintiff: Michele Hammonds
Defendant: Khushdeep Singh Thind, 2320959 Ontario Inc doing business as JMD Express, Ronnie Hooper, Jr, Rocking T Inc, Transportation Services Inc, John Doe, Transportation Services Inc doing business as TSI and Rosa M Garcia
Case Number: 2:2021cv00154
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to Rosa M Garcia, Administrator of the Estate of Jose Garcia and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
January 13, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service on 2320959 ONTARIO, INC. dba JMD EXPRESS, filed by Michele Hammonds. 2320959 Ontario Inc served on 1/7/2022. (Ruiz, Jose)
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Khushdeep Singh Thind.(Rupe, Alan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronnie Hooper, Jr, Rocking T Inc.(Mikles, Kara)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Transportation Services Inc.(Donovan, David)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ronnie Hooper, Jr, Rocking T Inc, Transportation Services Inc CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Mikles, Kara)
December 3, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the parties and description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michele Hammonds" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michele Hammonds(Ruiz, Jose) (Docket entry modified on 12/3/2021 to correct parties.)(cmn)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Hammonds's motion for extension of time for service; giving her an additional 90 days to complete service; and granting #9 motion for leave to file a first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/2021. (kdr)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Michele Hammonds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ruiz, Jose)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Michele Hammonds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ruiz, Jose)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time for Service by Michele Hammonds (Ruiz, Jose)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury demand by Khushdeep Singh Thind.(Rupe, Alan) (Docket text modified on 11/24/2021 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
November 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to 2320959 Ontario Inc and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Deficiency Letter notifying party that #1 Petition of Removal lacks an original signature. (kbc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Khushdeep Singh Thind. (kdr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Transportation Services Inc.(kdr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronnie Hooper, Jr and Rocking T Inc.(kdr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michele Hammonds.(kdr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Khushdeep Singh Thind from Monroe County Circuit Court, Case Number 48CV-21-63-1. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt number LIT084553. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds et al v. Thind et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Hammonds
Represented By: Ezra Jeremiah Smith
Represented By: Jose Miguel Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khushdeep Singh Thind
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2320959 Ontario Inc doing business as JMD Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Hooper, Jr
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocking T Inc
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Services Inc doing business as TSI
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa M Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?