Does v. Palestine-Wheatley School District et al
Plaintiff: Does Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of DR and Does C.W. and B.W., Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of D.R.
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District and John Estes
Case Number: 2:2021cv00163
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Does. (Caldwell, Theresa)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Does. (Caldwell, Theresa)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Kees, William)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kees, William)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/16/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/29/2022; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/17/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/7/2022. (ljb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John Estes, Palestine-Wheatley School District.(Kees, William)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Cody Kees on behalf of All Defendants (Kees, William)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George Jay Bequette, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Bequette, George)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Does. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084788. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Does v. Palestine-Wheatley School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of DR
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does C.W. and B.W., Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of D.R.
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Estes
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?