Richardson v. Meridian Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Richardson
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company and Meridian Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00171
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Meridian Security Insurance Company.(Sanders, Roy)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the parties and description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Meridian Security Insurance Company, filed by Kimberly Richardson" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Meridian Security Insurance Company, filed by Kimberly Richardson.(Griffin, Kalyn) (Docket entry modified on 1/20/2022 to correct parties.)(cmn)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/18/2022. (akr)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis A. Etoch on behalf of Kimberly Richardson (Etoch, Louis)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by Kimberly Richardson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Griffin, Kalyn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/8/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/21/2022; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/26/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/3/2022. (ljb)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Sanders, Roy)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Kimberly Richardson.(kdr)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company from Phillips County Circuit Court. Case Number 54CV-21-163. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084986. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Meridian Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Richardson
Represented By: Kalyn Etoch Griffin
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Roy G. Sanders
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Roy G. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?