Wills v. Yates
Plaintiff: Terrance Wills
Defendant: Yates and John P Yates
Case Number: 2:2022cv00205
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee in full by Wednesday, 1/11/2023, if he wishes to continue with this habeas action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/12/2022. (jbh)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Wills. (llg)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Mr. Wills an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; directing Mr. Wills to either file on or before Wednesday, 12/7/2022, the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts, or pay the $5.00 filing fee, in full; and instructing the Clerk of the Court to change the name of Respondent to John P. Yates, Warden, FCI Forrest City, Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/9/2022. (ldb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Terrance Wills.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wills v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?