Jones v. Mississippi Limestone Corporation
Plaintiff: Bobby L Jones
Defendant: Mississippi Limestone Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv00218
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie White Harrison on behalf of Bobby L Jones (Harrison, Laurie)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (editable image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #4 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in editable image file format. The correct document was added to docket entry #2 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/6/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/20/2024; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 5/12/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/29/2023. (ljb)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Harper Lee Kiefer on behalf of Mississippi Limestone Corporation (Kiefer, Harper) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/29/2023)) (jak).
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mississippi Limestone Corporation.(Campbell, Phil)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Phil W. Campbell on behalf of Mississippi Limestone Corporation (Campbell, Phil) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/29/2023)) (jak).
November 1, 2023 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Brian S. Miller. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/1/2023.(jak)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi Limestone Corporation, filed by Bobby L Jones. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT1064. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Mississippi Limestone Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby L Jones
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Laurie White Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Limestone Corporation
Represented By: Harper Lee Kiefer
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?