Cotton v. Garrett
Plaintiff: Torrance Cotton
Defendant: C Garrett
Case Number: 2:2023cv00231
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by C Garrett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 1)(Webster, John)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dennis Webster on behalf of C Garrett (Webster, John)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Torrance Cotton. (jak)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #3 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the Petition within 40 days after service of the Petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/13/2023. (lej)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 Filing Fee Received: $ 5, receipt number LIT4600. (adj)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Torrance Cotton. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Torrance Cotton.(ldb)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/29/2023. (lej)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Torrance Cotton. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton v. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrance Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Garrett
Represented By: John Dennis Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?