Morgan v. Southern Administrative Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roger Morgan
Defendant: Southern Administrative Services, Willowbend at Marion LLC doing business as Willowbend Healthcare and Rehabilitation, Progressive Eldercare Services Cross Inc doing business as River Ridge Rehab and Care Center, Three Rivers Nursing and Rehabilitation LLC, Southern Administrative Services LLC, Willowbend Health and Rehabilitation LLC originally named as Willowbend at Marion LLC doing business as Willowbend Healthcare and Rehabilitation, Cross SNF Operations LLC originally named as Progressive Eldercare Services Cross Inc doing business as River Ridge Rehabilitation and Care Center and Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC originally named as Three Rivers Nursing and Rehabilitation LLC doing business as Three Rivers Health and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2023cv00232
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Randall Songstad's motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/31/2024. (ljb)
January 29, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Randall N. Songstad. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4680487. Filed by Roger Morgan (Attachments: #1 Document)(Songstad, Randall)
January 29, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #21 Answer, #24 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #25 Stipulation. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC. (jbh)
January 26, 2024 Filing 25 STIPULATION (AGREED) by Cross SNF Operations LLC, Southern Administrative Services LLC, Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC, Willowbend Health and Rehabilitation LLC. (Dossett, Mark) (Docket text modified on 1/29/2024 to correct the party name.) (jbh)
January 26, 2024 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC (Dossett, Mark) (Docket text modified on 1/29/2024 to correct the party name.) (jbh)
January 26, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Cross SNF Operations LLC (Dossett, Mark)
January 26, 2024 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Willowbend Health and Rehabilitation LLC (Dossett, Mark)
January 26, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Cross SNF Operations LLC, Southern Administrative Services LLC, Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC, Willowbend Health and Rehabilitation LLC.(Dossett, Mark) (Docket text modified on 1/29/2024 to correct the party name.) (jbh)
January 25, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roger Morgan. (Sumpter, Roger)
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roger Morgan (Sumpter, Roger)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Southern Administrative Services, LLC's motion to dismiss. The motion to dismiss is granted on Morgan's Ark. Code Ann. 20-10-1003 claim and denied on his tortious interference with a business expectancy claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2024. (ljb)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Dr. Roger Morgan's motion to substitute parties as noted. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2024. (ljb)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Order dissolving temporary restraining order as moot per notice of mootness. See Doc. No. 9. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2024. (aow)
January 12, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Roger Morgan. (Sumpter, Roger)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Southern Administrative Services. (Dossett, Mark)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Substitute Party , #11 Response to Motion, #12 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in error (wrong image files). The correct document were added to docket entries #10 , #11 , and #12 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Response to Motion filed by Roger Morgan. (Sumpter, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/22/2023)) (jak).
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roger Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dr. Roger Morgan Affidavit, #2 Affidavit William McGinnis Affidavit)(Sumpter, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2023: #3 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/22/2023), #4 Affidavit 1 - Correct (submitted 12/22/2023), #5 Affidavit 2 - Correct (submitted 12/22/2023)) (jak).
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Party by Roger Morgan (Sumpter, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Southern Administrative Services re #8 Brief in Support, #7 MOTION for Order to Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Temporary Restraining Order of Mootness Regarding Motion to Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (Dossett, Mark)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion for Order to Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Southern Administrative Services. (Attachments: #1 Document Declaration of Melissa Browning)(Dossett, Mark)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Southern Administrative Services (Dossett, Mark)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Southern Administrative Services. (Dossett, Mark)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Southern Administrative Services (Dossett, Mark)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Administrative Services. (csf)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Court Judge on 11/28/2023. (csf)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roger Morgan. (csf)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Administrative Services from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-2023-1022. Fee $ 405 receipt number LIT4482 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Southern Administrative Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Morgan
Represented By: Randall N. Songstad
Represented By: Roger Dennis Sumpter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Administrative Services
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Mark Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willowbend at Marion LLC doing business as Willowbend Healthcare and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Eldercare Services Cross Inc doing business as River Ridge Rehab and Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Rivers Nursing and Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Mark Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willowbend Health and Rehabilitation LLC originally named as Willowbend at Marion LLC doing business as Willowbend Healthcare and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Mark Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross SNF Operations LLC originally named as Progressive Eldercare Services Cross Inc doing business as River Ridge Rehabilitation and Care Center
Represented By: Mark Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Rivers SNF Operations LLC originally named as Three Rivers Nursing and Rehabilitation LLC doing business as Three Rivers Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Mark Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?