Pitts v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Defendant: L Watson, Haywood and Padilla
Case Number: 2:2024cv00047
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #8 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/25/2024. (ljb)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #5 recommended disposition; and dismissing Pitts's complaint without prejudice because he failed to pay the filing fee as ordered #4 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/25/2024. (ljb)
April 25, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 MOTION for Discovery. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (wrong case) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. (kbc)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Recommended Disposition by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (llg)
April 22, 2024 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (llg) Docket text modified on 4/25/2024 to indicate filed in error. (kbc)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending #2 Mr. Pitts' Complaint be dismissed without prejudice; and the Clerk be instructed to close this case. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 04/19/2024. (llg)
March 14, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS" as marked on the document. (jak)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff to pay the $405 filing and administrative fee within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 03/13/2024. (llg) (Docket text modified on 3/14/2024 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT TO #2 Complaint by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (csf)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts.(csf)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?