Walker v. McIntosh, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00060
Filed: April 8, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 193 Dismissing Case with prejudice pursuant to the notices of voluntary dismissal by stipulation filed in this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/09. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to the notices of voluntary dismissal by stipulation that have been filed in this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/26/09. (jct)
January 15, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 179 & 181 Notices of Voluntary Dismissal, separate defendants Buzzy Faulkner, Sonny McIntosh, Robert Wright & Butch Davis are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/15/09. (jct)
December 15, 2008 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 185 Motion to Seal Exhibits C, E, F & G attached to Document 183 Brief. The stated exhibits are to be placed under seal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/08. (jct)
September 12, 2008 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 163 Joint MOTION to Continue. The bench trial of this matter previously set for 9/22/08 is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/08. (jct)
September 2, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 154 OF U. S. Magistrate Judge H. David Young in its entirety as this Court's findings. Because the amended complaint filed on 4/26/05 was filed without leave of Court, and because it was never served on any of the named defendants, the amendment will not be permitted. The amended complaint 6 is hereby stricken. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. McIntosh, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?