Pitchford v. Turbitt

Case Number: 3:2006cv00044
Filed: March 20, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of its Order filed 9/8/10. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/6/2010. (jct)
September 8, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order; denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/8/2010. (jct)
May 20, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order. This action is closed, and the Court lacks authority to vacate a Dismissal Order affirmed by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 5/20/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitchford v. Turbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?