House et al v. Conseco Insurance Group

Case Number: 3:2006cv00067
Filed: April 24, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss without prejudice. As a condition to refiling this action, plaintiffs will be required to reimburse Defendant any reasonable costs it will incur in having to duplicate matters from this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/09. (jct)
December 11, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 115 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/11/08. (jct)
December 4, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 115 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel, Defendant's response deadline is extended to & including 12/8/08. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/4/08. (jct)
April 27, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Limited Admission/Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Griffin, granting 8 Motion for Limited Admission/Pro Hac Vice of Jacob M. Jenkins & granting 9 Motion for Limited Admission/Pro Hac Vice of Howard R. Brown, for Deft Conseco Insurance Group. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/27/06. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House et al v. Conseco Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?