Jusko v. Jackson

Plaintiff: Daniel R Jusko
Defendant: Farris Jackson, Will Jackson, Arkansas State Highway Department and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00021
Filed: March 1, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement; denying as moot 63 MOTION for Settlement. The Court will reserve jurisdiction for a period of 30 days to enforce the settlement agreement if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/09. (jct)
October 21, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 92 Shelby County Health Care Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement, allowing it to supplement its response to the said motion on or before 11/4/09. Any reply will be due on or before 11/11/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/09. (jct)
July 16, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion to Dismiss filed by Shelby County Health Care Corporation, d/b/a Regional Medical Center (hereinafter "the Med"). The Court hereby instructs the Med to respond to 63 Jusko's Motion for Settlement within 10 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/16/09. (jct)
May 26, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Curtis H. Goetsch for Shelby County Health Care Corporation. The requirement of Local Rule 83.5(d) that Curtis H. Goetsch designate local counsel is waived. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/26/09. (jct)
February 20, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Defendant Farris Jackson's Motion for Joinder. Jackson is hereby directed to take the steps necessary to make Shelby County Health Care Corporation d/b/a Regional Medical Center a party to this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/20/09. (jct)
September 22, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay pending the entry of an order in the Mississippi Chancery Court of Desoto County, Mississippi. Plaintiff is directed to notify this Court within ten days following entry of the Chancery Court's order approving or disapproving settlement of this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/22/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jusko v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farris Jackson
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R Jusko
Represented By: Elton A. Rieves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?