Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church v. First Nation Insurance Group et al

Plaintiff: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church
Defendant: First Nation Insurance Group, AA Risk Management Inc, AA Communications Inc, Gwen Moyo, Craig Greene, John Does and Doe Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00043
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice the claims against Doe Companies 1-10, Vijay Kumar, Paul Bhandari, and Terrance Bhojal; the claims by Old St. Paul Missionary Baptist Church against First Nation Insurance Group, Gwen Moyo, Craig Greene, and Daniel Esparza with respect to which the Court's 159 Opinion and Order did not grant summary judgment in favor of Old St. Paul Paul Missionary Baptist Church are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/6/2010. (mkf)
April 30, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 163 MOTION to Continue filed by Daniel Esparza. ( Final Pretrial Conference set before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/2010 at 4:00 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 ). Counsel are directed to be present & be prepared to present all motions & arguments that need to be heard & considered before the voir dire panel is assembled on 5/4/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/30/2010. (jct)
April 16, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 156 Motion for Summary Judgment. Trial on the remaining issues will begin at 9:00 a.m., May 4, 2010, in the large courtroom in Jonesboro, AR, counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m.. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/16/10. (bkp)
March 15, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 MOTION for Extension of Motion Deadline filed by Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church. The motion deadline is extended up to & including 3/15/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/2010. (jct)
March 5, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 130 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/5/10. (bkp)
February 24, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 135 Third MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for First Nation Insurance Group filed by Barrett & Deacon, P.A. & 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church, scheduling a hearing by telephone to begin at 10:00 a.m., C ST, on 3/5/10. THE COURT ORDERS First Nation Insurance Group to have an officer who is knowledgeable about this litigation & authorized to speak on behalf of that entity available to participate in the telephone hearing. The name & telephone number of that officer must be provided to the Court by close of business on 3/3/10. Barrett & Deacon is ORDERED to provide a copy of this Order to First Nation Insurance Group immediately, & to file a certificate of service with the Court stating when & how this Order was transmitted to First Nation Insurance Group. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2010. (jct)
February 19, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is hereby extended up to & inclduing 3/2/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/19/2010. (jct)
February 10, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on personal jurisdiction as the matter is not yet ripe for the Court's review; denying as moot 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for service. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/09. (jct)
October 6, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 111 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 102 RENEWED MOTION to Strike & MOTION for Ruling on personal jurisdiction. The response deadline is hereby extended up to & including 10/22/08. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/6/08. (jct)
September 3, 2008 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike First Nation Insurance Group's Answer to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/3/08. (jct)
April 24, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Justin R. Giles, III, will be permitted to appear & participate in these proceedings as co-counsel for Defts Gwen Mayo, Craig Greene, First Nation Insurance Group, AA Risk Management Inc & AA Communications Inc. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 4/24/07. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church v. First Nation Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church
Represented By: Lawrence W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Nation Insurance Group
Represented By: Brandon J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA Risk Management Inc
Represented By: Mark Nicholas Ohrenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA Communications Inc
Represented By: Mark Nicholas Ohrenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Moyo
Represented By: Mark Nicholas Ohrenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Greene
Represented By: Mark Nicholas Ohrenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?