Smith v. Barney et al

Plaintiff: Kiara Smith
Defendant: Anson Barney, Billy Joe Hancock and Dustin Lacotts
Case Number: 3:2007cv00049
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Court directs that the Clerk of the Court disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $654.28 & distribute to James D Robertson of Barber, McCaskill, Jones & Hale, PA for the reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/2/09. (jct)
August 21, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL directing the Court to remove Jim Robertson as the attorney of record for the Plaintiff & to show that Plaintiff Kiara Smith is proceeding pro se. The Court wishes to express its appreciation to Mr. Robertson for the excellent legal representation he provided Kiara Smith. The Court directs that Mr. Robertson shall be exempt from any future appointments under Local Rule 83.7 for a period of two years from this date. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/21/09. (jct)
August 17, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, directing that Defendants are not to elicit any testimony or to present any documentary evidence containing or referring to underlying details of the robbery convict ion; dismissing as moot 119 & 123 Defendants' Motions in Limine, with one exception. Plaintiff's counsel may inquire of the jury panel during voir dire as to whether they are employed by, or have any connection with, the Arkansas Municipal League. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/17/09. (jct)
July 17, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Dept of Correction to ensure plaintiff's appearance at the jury trial scheduled for Wednesday, August 19, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. at the U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro, AR, along with plaintiff's complete medical file. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/17/09. (bkp)
July 14, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part solely to the extent stated 103 Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine; granting 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Appearance in Civilian Clothes at Trial. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/14/09. (jct)
April 1, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing James D. Robertson to represent Plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action. The Court will be in touch with counsel for both parties to schedule the case for trial. The Clerk is directed to send counsel & Plaintiff a copy of this Order. Counsel is directed to access & review Local Rule 83.7 regarding appointment of counsel, & Local Rule 83.6 regarding reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses, through the Court's web site. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 4/1/09. (jct)
March 31, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 72 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims for the tort of outrage, Miranda rights vio lations & civil conspiracy are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motions are DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's Section 1983 claim for excessive force in violation of the Fourth Amendment. That claim will proceed to trial. Simultaneously with the filing of this Order, the Court is appointing an attorney to assist Mr. Smith in presenting his case at trial. The case will be scheduled for trial following the successful appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 3/31/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Barney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anson Barney
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Joe Hancock
Represented By: Angela Renee Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Lacotts
Represented By: Angela Renee Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?