Seals v. American Greetings Corporation

Plaintiff: Mary Seals
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00066
Filed: May 24, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 74 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered this date, in favor of American Greetings Corporation on the claims of Mary Seals. The complaint of Mary Seals is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/24/09. (jct)
September 18, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Paul Waddell, Scott Jackson & Gena Beredo, counsel for Defendant in these matters, to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, on Monday, September 21, 2009, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/18/09. (jct)
March 4, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/09. (jct)
September 11, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jonathan S Forman as co-counsel for Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/08. (jct)
June 7, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION directing that 3:07CV00066 & 3:07CV00071 be consolidated as they both are the result of an incident that occurred on or about 7/22/06, with both cases to be handled by Judge J. Leon Holmes. Each of the actions will remain separate cases but will be tried before this Court at the same time. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/07. (jct)
May 29, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's attention to the fact that she is required to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claim. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Plaintiff by both regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/07. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seals v. American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?