Harris v. American Greetings Corporation
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00071
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 66 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered this date, in favor of American Greetings Corporation on the claims of Angela Harris. The complaint of Angela Harris is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/24/09. (jct)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER authorizing Paul Waddell, Scott Jackson & Gena Beredo, counsel for Defendant, to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, on Monday, September 21, 2009, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/18/09. (jct)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 38 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/09. (jct)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jonathan S Forman as co-counsel for Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/08. (jct)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION directing that 3:07CV00071 & 3:07CV00066 be consolidated as they both are the result of an incident that occurred on or about 7/22/06, with both cases to be handled by Judge J. Leon Holmes. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, Case reassign ed to Judge J. Leon Holmes for all further proceedings. Judge James M Moody no longer assigned to case. Each of the actions will remain separate cases but will be tried before this Court at the same time. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/07. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Greetings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?