Brown v. Crittenden County Sheriff Department et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Brown
Defendant: Crittenden County Sheriff Department, Richard Busby, Wren, Mickey Thornton, Teresa Bonner, J C Shelton and Does
Case Number: 3:2007cv00083
Filed: June 21, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 185 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/12/09. (jct)
February 26, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, in light of Plaintiff's objections, declining to adopt 178 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere; DENYING 176 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail Plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff has 10 days from the entry date of this Order in which to complete the application, attesting to information under penalty of perjury, and mail to the Clerk for filing. Failure to follow this Order will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/26/09. (jct)
January 30, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the Court to grant 176 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss & recommending the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without prejudice, under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) & Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), for failure to comply with 172 Order entered 11/17/08. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/30/09. (jct)
January 6, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 167 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in all respects in its entirety. Accordingly, 164 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff shall be permitted to proceed on his equal protection claim against Defendants Busby, Wren, Bonner, Shelton, Caldwell, Crawford, Beasley & Thornton. Plaintiff shall be permitted to proceed on his retaliation claim against Defendants Thornton, Mobley & Beasley. Plaintiff's negligence & medical malpractice claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Separate Defendants Lindsey Peterson, Christie Cole & Crittenden County, Arkansas are dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/09. (jct)
September 4, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 157 of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Accordingly 134 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mickey Thornton is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/4/08. (jct) Modified on 9/5/2008 to correct typo(jct).
June 25, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Defendants' Motion to Clarify; finding as moot 5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are excused from answering or otherwise responding to any of the Complaints currently filed with the Cour t. Plaintiff is ordered to file an Amended Complaint w/i 30 days of entry of this Order. That Amended Complaint will supersede all previously filed complaints. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis in this Court, he is directed to file an application w/i 30 days of entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Beth Deere on 6/25/07. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Crittenden County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Sheriff Department
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Busby
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wren
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Thornton
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Shelton
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Clifford McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?