Lee v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP et al

Plaintiff: Danny Lee
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP and Nucor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00098
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 179 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the Jury Verdict on April 18, 2013, following five days of trial, in favor of defendants Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP and Nucor Corporation. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that, on all claims, judgment is rendered for defendants Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP and Nucor Corporation and plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/23/2013. (jak)
April 11, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating rulings on the parties' objections to designations and counter-designations of deposition and trial testimony re 106 , 164 , 163 , and 108 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/11/2013. (jak)
April 10, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Charles Quinn, Rusty Adams, Bryce Brewer, and John Phillips to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the United States Courthouse in Jonesboro beginning Friday, April 12, 2013, and each day thereafter until the trial is completed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/10/2013. (jak)
April 8, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding rulings on the Parties' Motions in Limine. Denying Defendants' 120 , 122 , 131 , 134 , 137 and 147 Motions; Granting Defendants' 124 , 132 , 133 , 145 , 146 , and 153 Motions. Defendants' 135 an d 148 Motions are granted in part and denied in part as stated in this Order. Plaintiff's 154 and 155 Motions are denied. Plaintiff's 156 Motion is granted in part and denied in part as stated in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/08/2013. (jak)
April 5, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 105 Objections to Defendants' pretrial disclosures. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/05/2013. (jak)
August 30, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 102 Defendants' Motion to Strike deposition excerpts pending resolution of the case of Bennett v. Nucor, Case No. 3:04-CV-00291-SWW, which is on appeal. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/30/2011. (jct)
September 30, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 65 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/09. (jct)
January 26, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 44 Motion for Reconsideration, to Intervene & for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief of non-party movants Jonathan Lee Riches, Lionel Messi & Sheila Taormina; granting 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Non-Party Motion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to no longer accept any filings from Jonathan Lee Riches, in any case, without approval from the Court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/26/09. (jct)
December 3, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert L. Wiggins, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company LLP
Represented By: Andrew H. Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Andrew H. Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?