Nance et al v. Sammis et al

Plaintiff: Unseld Nance, Sr and Pamela Farrow
Defendant: Erik Sammis, Jimmy Evans, William Johnson, Robert Paudert, West Memphis Arkansas, City of and Does
Case Number: 3:2007cv00119
Filed: September 4, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Taurus Bailey to bring a cell phone, laptop computer or personal digital assistant, subject to the stated rules, into the U.S. Federal Building & Courthouse in Jonesboro between 4/18/11 & 4/22/11. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/18/2011. (jct)
April 13, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing the following named individuals to bring a cell phone, laptop computer or personal digital assistant, subject to the stated rules, into the U.S. Federal Building & Courthouse in Jonesboro between 4/18/11 & 4/22/11: Bennie O'Neil, Glenwood Roane, Javier Bailey, Deborah Farrow, Pam Farrow, Unseld Nance, Sr., Paul Charton, Chris Michaels, Pipere Brettell, Robb Helt, Jamie Nash & Melissa Hatfield. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/2011. (jct)
March 24, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, per 170 Joint MOTION to Clarify, reflecting the Plaintiffs may not press any state law claims against the City, as those claims were only against the individual officers. Further, plaintiffs do not have any equal protection claims remaining against the City. After reviewing the record as a whole, it appears that no party has presented any evidence that would support a Section 1985 claim. Based on this, it appears the Eighth Circuit was correct in reading the record as a whole to rais e only Section 1983 claims against the City. Therefore, Plaintiffs have no Section 1985 claims remaining against the City. After reviewing the record as whole, no claims remain against the City of West Memphis. Defendant West Memphis Arkansas, City of terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/24/2011. (jct)
March 11, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated, 141 Defendants' Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/2011. (jct)
November 10, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to 141 Defendants' Joint MOTION in Limine within 14 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/10/2010. (jct)
February 11, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending the decision of the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals on 147 Interlocutory Appeal. The trial set for 2/17/09 is removed from the Court's calendar. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/11/09. (jct)
February 10, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 139 Defendants Johnson, Paudert, Sammis & Evans' Motion for Reconsideration of 136 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/10/09. (jct)
February 5, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as stated 38 Defts Evans, Johnson, Paudert & Sammis' Motion for Summary Judgment & 82 Supplement; granting in part and denying in part 40 Defts Evans, Johnson, Paudert & Sammis' Motion for S ummary Judgment & 83 Supplement; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment of West Memphis, Arkansas, City Of; granting in part and denying in part as stated 75 Defts Evans, Johnson, Paudert & Sammis' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [7 8] Motion for Summary Judgment of West Memphis, Arkansas, City Of; granting in part and denying in part as stated 80 Defts Evans, Johnson, Paudert & Sammis' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 87 Defts Evans, Johnson, Paudert & Sammis' Motion to Exclude testimony of Pltfs' expert. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/5/09. (jct)
January 26, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 129 Scheduling Order. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2009 at 1:00 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller; Jury Trial set for 2/17/2009 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Counsel has advised the trial of this matter will take approximately 5 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/26/09. (jct)
January 22, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the official capacity claims against Defendants Erik Sammis, Jimmy Evans, William Johnson & Robert Paudert in the consolidated case of Farrow v. Sammis, Case No. 3:07-CV-00189. The official capacity claims against Defendants unknown West Memphis police officers in Nance v. Sammis, Case No. 3:07-CV-00119, are also dismissed & they are dismissed from this action. The Clerk's Office is directed to correct the docket sheet to reflect the spelling of "Deborah Farrow" and "DeAunta Farrow". Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/22/09. (jct)
January 15, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. The Court directs Plaintiffs to provide supplemental responses as discussed on or before 1/20/09. Although the Court will not impose the drastic sanction of dismissal, the Court will requi re Plaintiffs' counsel to pay a nominal attorney's fee in the amount of $200 to counsel for separate Defendants, which fees were incurred as a result of Plaintiffs' failure to comply with the motion to compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/15/09. (jct)
December 19, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiffs to provide responses to the outstanding discovery and to supplement their initial disclosures on or before December 22, 2008. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/19/08. (bkp)
September 22, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Cases 3:07CV00119 & 3:07CV00189 are hereby consolidated with pleadings to be filed only in the lead case, 3:07CV00119. The Court will issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/22/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance et al v. Sammis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unseld Nance, Sr
Represented By: Glenwood P. Roane, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Farrow
Represented By: Glenwood P. Roane, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Sammis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?