Razorback Concrete Company v. Dement Construction LLC

Plaintiff: Razorback Concrete Company
Defendant: Dement Construction LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00135
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Plaintiff's Motion for prejudgment interest; granting in part and denying in part 127 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs; denying 134 Defendant's Motion for Costs; denying 136 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is hereby awarded prejudgment interest of $17,691.38; attorneys' fees in the amount of $23,942.27, & costs in the amount of $1,618.60. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/4/2012. (jct)
November 15, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT in favor of Razorback Concrete Company against Dement Construction Company LLC, pursuant to 119 Jury Verdict. IT IS THEREFORE CONSIDERED, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Razorback Concrete Company have & recover of & from Defendant Dement Construction Company LLC the sum of $71,826.82, together with interest from date until paid at the rate of 0.11% per annum as provided by law. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/15/2011. (jct)
May 17, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for 11/7/2011 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. All deadlines for discovery & motions have expired. All other deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/17/2011. (jct)
January 22, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing Plaintiff's fraud claim & claims for punitive damages & lost profits. Plaintiff's claim for breach of contract remains. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 91 Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate, 92 Motion for Ruling & 70 Motion to Exclude expert opinions are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 93 Defendant's Motion in Limine is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE & may be resubmitted at a time closer to trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/22/2010. (jct)
October 21, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for week of 4/19/2010 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Deadlines for discovery & motions have expired; all other deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/21/09. (jct)
August 14, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court (DUPLICATE ENTRY OF 67 - DISREGARD): STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/09. (bkp) (entry modified on 8/17/2009 to indicate it is a duplicate of entry 67 )(bfw).
July 21, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery & Filing of Dispositive Motions. As stated in the Court's final scheduling order, the parties are free to extend the discovery deadline, & have agreed to ex tend the discovery deadline to 9/4/09 & the deadline for disclosing expert witnesses to 8/1/09. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended up to & including 9/4/09. Defendant is directed to adhere to Rule 5(d) & to cease filing deposition notices. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/21/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razorback Concrete Company v. Dement Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Razorback Concrete Company
Represented By: John Dewey Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dement Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?