Nelson Design Group LLC v. Puckett et al
Plaintiff: |
Nelson Design Group LLC |
Defendant: |
State Development LLC, Brent Phillips, Richard Puckett, Barry Phillips and Phillips Investments & Construction Inc |
Case Number: |
3:2007cv00177 |
Filed: |
November 21, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Craighead |
Presiding Judge: |
James M Moody |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyright |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
92
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Nelson Design Group LLC & State Development LLC. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/20/2010. (jct)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting as stated 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs. The Court awards Plaintiff Nelson Design Group LLC $25,690 in attorney's fees & $1,505.91 in costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/8/09. (jct)
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing
81
JUDGMENT, pursuant to 80 Order, directing Defendant Richard Puckett to pay damages in the amount of $8,500 to Plaintiff Nelson Design Group LLC, & Defendant State Development LLC is ordered to pay damages in the amount of $4,250 to Plaint iff Nelson Design Group LLC. Puckett & State Development are ordered to pay the reasonable attorney's fees & costs incurred by Nelson Design in prosecuting its claims against Puckett & State Development. Puckett & State Development are jointly & severally liable for these fees & costs, which will be determined by the Court once Nelson Design has submitted its verified fee petition. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/30/09. (jct)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing
80
ORDER, after a bench trial, finding that Richard Puckett, Barry Phillips, Brent Phillips & State Development LLC infringed upon Nelson Design Group LLC's copyrights numbered NDG128R, NDG220, NDG508, NDG510 & NDG905. State Development LLC, upon whose behalf Barry Phillips & Brent Phillips purchased the designs, is ordered to pay damages to Nelson Design in the amount of $4,250.00. The record is clear that Puckett intentionally copied Nelson Design's copyrighted designs. Richard Puckett is hereby ordered to pay damages to Nelson Design in the amount of $8,500.00. All defendants are hereby enjoined from ever using the designs at issue in this lawsuit & from engaging in any future activity that infringes, in any way, upo n the copyrighted designs of Nelson Design. Puckett & State Development are hereby ordered to pay the reasonable attorney's fees incurred by Nelson Design in the enforcement of the five designs that Puckett & State Development infringed. Pucke tt & State Development are jointly & severally liable for said fees, which are to be determined by the Court. Nelson Design is to prepare a verified fee petition & submit it within 30 days of this Order. Central States Development Inc did not receive services from Puckett & therefore all claims against it are dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/09. (jct)
|
June 25, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER authorizing Gerald A. Coleman, Hunter J. Hanshaw, Janetta (Jan) R. Roberts, Karolina Majewski & Richard Puckett to bring a cell phone, laptop computer or personal digital assistant into the U.S. Federal Building & Courthouse in Jonesboro between 6/29/09 & 7/2/09, subject to the stated provisions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/09. (jct)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Phillips Investments & Construction Inc, & dismissing with prejudice plaintifff's claims against Phillips Investments & Construction Inc. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/08. (jct)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?