Steele v. Crook et al

Plaintiff: Connie Steele
Defendant: Graham L Crook, Hertz Rental Car LLC, Hertz Corporation and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00197
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement; granting 61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Any & all claims of Plaintiff against separate Defendant, Graham L. Crook, in the original Complaint & any Amended Complaints are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 2/11/2010. (jct)
December 23, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Separate Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Any and all claims of Plaintiff against American Family Mutual Insurance Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 12/23/09. (jct)
June 12, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Motion Deadline is hereby, held in abeyance pending a response from Plaintiff and Separate Defendant Graham L. Crook to this Order, which shall be filed not later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, June 22, 2009. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 6/12/09. (dac)
February 25, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Hertz Corporation & Hertz Rental Car, LLC; denying as moot, without prejudice, 27 Hertz Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Party & 29 Motion to Enforce Settlement. All claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Hertz are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 2/25/09. (jct)
January 21, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Defendant Graham L. Crook's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 1/21/09. (jct)
December 31, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 12/31/08. (jct)
November 17, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall provide the Initial Disclosures required by Fed.R.Civ.P.26(a)(1) not later than 12/5/08, & file a Status Report with the Court confirming compli ance with this Order. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby placed on notice that the failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of all claims asserted against American Family Mutural Insurance. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 11/17/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Crook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Steele
Represented By: John Michael Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham L Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Rental Car LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?