Adams v. Arkansas Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Joe Adams
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2008cv00025
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement; granting 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joe Adams. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/22/2010. (jct)
November 12, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to General Order 54, Luther Oneal Sutter, Joe Adams, Carmen Mosley-Sims, John Finkbeiner, Krista Hughes & Carolyn Singleton are authorized to bring electronic devices to the 12/10/09 settlement conference to be held in Room 1B, Richard Sheppard Arnold U. S. Courthouse, Little Rock. Each authorized party will be required to present a copy of this Order upon entry into the building to verify this authorization. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/12/09. (jct)
August 11, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The Defendant is forewarned that it will be prohibited from introducing any evidence at trial, whether testimonial or documentary, that relates in any way to the information that it claims it does not have or that it has objected to producing. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (jct)
March 25, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling a Settlement Conference for 4/15/2009 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1B before Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau. Under General Order 54, Chris Gomlicker, Joe Adams, Carmen Mosley-Sims & Carolyn Singleton are authorized to bring electronic devices to the Courthouse for this proceeding. The parties are to submit a confidential letter pursuant to this Order no later than 4/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 3/25/09. (jct)
March 18, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial. The Bench Trial is rescheduled for 11/30/09 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom #324. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Arkansas Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Adams
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?