Smith v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Sandra Dee Smith
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00039
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 35 Memorandum and Order entered this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice; the relief sought is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/31/2010. (jct) (copy of Memorandum and Order & Judgment forwarded to ALJ)
April 1, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration. This case is remanded to the Commissioner as a "sentence six" remand. The Clerk shall administratively close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/1/09. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
February 10, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, or otherwise move. Social Security Administration's answer deadline extended up to & including 3/13/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/10/09. (jct)
January 6, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, without prejudice, for Plaintiff's failure to provide proof of service on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/6/09. (jct) Modified on 1/23/2009 to reflect Order VACATED pursuant to 15 Order (jct).
December 5, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Plaintiff that she must obtain service on Defendant within 30 days of entry of this Order, or the Complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/5/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dee Smith
Represented By: John C. Barttelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?