G&K Services Company v. Bill's Super Foods Inc

Plaintiff: G&K Services Company
Defendant: Bill's Super Foods Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00048
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2014 256 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SUBSTITUTED ORDER amending and substituting 255 Order. Therefore, 219 Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in all other respects. Defendant is entitled to $24,744.08 in attorneys' fees from Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to remit $60,226.82 to G&K Services, Co. and return the remaining $22,773.18 to Bills Super Foods, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/8/2014. (srw)
October 7, 2014 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 219 Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in all other respects. Defendant is entitled to $24,744.08 in attorneys' fees from Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to remit $58,255.92 to G&K Services, Co. and return the remaining $24,744.08 to Bills Super Foods, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/7/2014. (srw)
October 16, 2013 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 241 Defendants' Motion to Stay Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/16/2013. (srw)
August 14, 2013 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 232 Defendant's Amended Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/14/2013. (srw)
August 1, 2013 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 229 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; and directing Defendant, if it has case law that states the ADTPA trumps the prevailing party rule, to provide it by 5:00 p.m., 8/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/1/2013. (srw)
July 25, 2013 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 217 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; and denying 219 Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Plaintiff is entitled to $82,766.50 in attorneys' fees and $2,204.40 in costs from Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/25/2013. (srw)
June 12, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; Denying 210 Defendant's Motion for Judgment; Denying 212 Defendant's Motion for Prejudgment Interest; and granting 204 Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Both parties are entitled to post-judgment interest at 0.14% annum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/12/2013. (jak)
May 8, 2013 194 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 188 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of G&K Services Company on the claim for liquidated damages and in favor of Bill's Super Foods, Inc. on the counterclaim for deceptive trade practices. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/8/2013. (srw)
April 29, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 162 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Billy Orr without prejudice; denying without prejudice 169 Plaintiff's Third Motion in Limine and Objections to Charts; granting 171 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Establish Certain Facts for which No Proof will be Required; and denying without prejudice in part and granting in part 175 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion in Limine and Objection to Charts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/29/2013. (thd)
April 12, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED with respect to the document requests in Defendants' subpoena and Leslie Wood and Bill Harris shall comply with the subpoena and appear at the time specified. The request for attorneys fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 04/12/2013. (jak)
April 25, 2012 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court prepared for a March 27, 2012 settlement conference, and thus learned facts and formed opinions and judgments about the merits of this case, accordingly, he must recuse. Therefore, the Court directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this case to another United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/25/2012. (kcs)
April 24, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for week beginning 1/14/2013 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. All deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting: Motions in limine are due w/i 14 days of trial but no later than noon Friday before trial & agreed jury instructions are due no later than 14 days prior to trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/24/2012. (jct)
April 6, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing the parties that the trial previously set for 5/7/2012 must be continued. The Court is inclined to move this action to Little Rock for trial. The Court will give the parties to & including 4/16/2012 in which to advise this Court why this action should not be moved to Little Rock for trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/6/2012. (jct)
March 15, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the parties have advised the Court that they no longer wish to participate in a settlement conference, accordingly the conference re 133 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/15/2012. (kcs)
June 29, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for week beginning 5/7/2012 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; amended Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/9/2012. All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/29/2011. (jct)
June 28, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue. The Court will establish a new trial setting in due course. With respect to 113 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine, the Court, given that this matter is now being continued, denies without prejudice & will not at this time address any of the matters set forth therein. Rather, the Court will address the matters set forth as circumstances at trial may warrant. The Court's ruling on Defendants' motions will remain in effect for the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/2011. (jct)
June 7, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 defendants' renewed Motion in Limine; denying 108 defendants' renewed Second Motion in Limine; denying 111 defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Amended & Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration; denying [112 ] defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended & Supplemental Renewed Motion in Limine; denying 122 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Third Amended Complaint; denying 123 defendants' Motion for Leave to File a supplemental & Second Amended Counterclaim. The Court defers ruling on 113 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/7/2011. (jct)
June 24, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the 7/19/10 trial date because of a trial setting in another matter that takes precedence. The Court will issue an amended Scheduling Order in due course. The Court denies without prejudice 93 & 95 MOTIONS in Limine filed by Bill's Super Foods Inc, Billy Orr. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/24/2010. (jct)
January 7, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 91 Final Scheduling Order, vacating the deadlines for discovery, dispositive motions, & motions to amend the pleadings. The trial date of 7/19/2010 shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/7/2010. (jct)
October 28, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of 87 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/28/09. (jct)
September 15, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings & disposition in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 44 Plaintiff's Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted in part & denied in part as set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings & Recommended Disposition. The Court will issue an amended scheduling order in due course. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/15/09. (jct)
July 23, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Admitted; denying 61 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying as moot 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; denying 72 Defendants' Motion to Compel; denying 74 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer & Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/23/09. (jct)
February 9, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/9/09. (jct)
February 2, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending discovery deadline to & including 3/16/2009; extending dispositive motions deadline to & including 3/30/09. The 4/20/09 trial date is hereby continued & will be reset following a ruling on G&K Services' motion for summary judgment. Following the conclusion of discovery, the parties, if they deem necessary, may supplement their existing summary judgment pleadings no later than 3/30/09. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/09. (jct)
December 17, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment & 28 MOTION to Deem Admitted its Local Rule 56.1 Statement; granting in part & denying in part 33 Defendants' MOTION to Compel as stated herein; & granting [35 ] Defendants' MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer & Counterclaim to Third Amended Complaint. The Court will issue an Order establishing new deadlines for conducting discovery & filing dispositive motions in due course. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/17/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&K Services Company v. Bill's Super Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&K Services Company
Represented By: William Dean Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill's Super Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?