Helton v. Southland Racing Corporation

Plaintiff: Dianna L Helton
Defendant: Southland Racing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00054
Filed: April 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 35 Bill of Costs filed by Southland Racing Corporation, directing that Defendant be awarded costs from Plaintiff Dianna Helton in the amount of $1,572.26. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/2010. (jct)
February 23, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 33 Order entered this date, in favor of Southland Racing Corporation against Dianna L Helton. The complaint is hereby dismissed. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/09. (jct)
February 11, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding settlement conference set 2/13/09 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 1B, Richard Sheppard Arnold U. S. Courthouse, Little Rock, under General Order No. 54, Marc I. Baretz, Jane A. Kim, William Stuart Jackson, Dianna L. & Doug Helton, Wes Culler & T roy Keeping are authorized to bring electronic devices to the Courthouse for this proceeding. Each will be required to present a copy of this Order upon entry into the building to verify this authorization. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/11/09. (jct)
February 4, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Settlement Conference for 2/13/2009 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1B before Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau. The parties are directed to submit a confidental letter with specified information by 12 noon on 2/11/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/4/09. (jct)
September 25, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/25/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helton v. Southland Racing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna L Helton
Represented By: Marc I. Baretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Racing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?