Engle v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Marie Engle
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00055
Filed: April 4, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting, as amended, 15 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Commissioner is directed to certify & pay to David Throesch, attorney for Plaintiff, the amount of $3,689.00 as attorney's fees pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/10/2010. (jct)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA, directing counsel to file, on or before 2/4/10, an affidavit clarifying the amount of fees requested & itemizing the work expended on Plaintiff's behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/22/10. (jct)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 13 Memorandum Opinion And Order entered this date, this case is reversed & remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/20/09. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engle v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Engle
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?