Edgar v. Langston et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne Edgar
Defendant: Dan Langston, Tim Cavness, Ron Harvey, Aron Gamber, Tim Long, John Anderson and Does
Case Number: 3:2008cv00068
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 76 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/09. (mkf)
January 14, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, pursuant to Plaintiff's failure to respond to this Court's 12/12/08 Order, recommending that the 1 Complaint & 10 Amended Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice, & recommending that 63 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/14/09. (jct)
December 10, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 59 Mail Returned, directing plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address & his intent to continue prosectuion with this action, pro se, within 15 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/10/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgar v. Langston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Cavness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aron Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?