Johnson v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan B Johnson
Defendant: Larry Zane Boyd, Theresa Bonner, Richard D Busby, Bersly, Mobley and Taylor
Case Number: 3:2008cv00084
Filed: May 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Motion for Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff's counsel. The Court orders that the Clerk disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $973.65 & distribute to the named applicant. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/31/2011. (jct)
September 21, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/21/2010. (jct)
January 5, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Attorney Phillip H. McMath to represent Plaintiff Jonathan B. Johnson in this Section 1983 action. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. McMath a copy of this Order & Local Rule 83.7, and is directed to refrain from docketing any future pro se pleadings submitted by Plaintiff. All future pleadings must be filed & signed by Plaintiff's appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/5/2010. (jct)
December 15, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 96 of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 76 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, such that Plaintiff shall PROCEED with his failure to protect & free exercise of religion claims against Defendants in their individual capacities only; and all other claims are DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/09. (jct)
November 9, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 16 Answer, directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect that Defendant Boyd is "Zane Boyd", Defendant Bonner is "Teresa Bonner", Defendant Busby is "Richard Busby" & Defendant Beasly is "Beasley". Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/9/09. (jct)
April 23, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 85 REPORT AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the John Doe Defendants are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to a lack of service, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m). The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/09. (jct)
January 16, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/16/09. (jct)
December 3, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall FILE, within 15 days of the entry of this Order, his Response to Interrogatory 6 and the Medical Authorizations attached to Defendants' Second Request for Production. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely & properly do so will result in this case being dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/3/08. (jct)
November 5, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Discovery deadline on or before 2/3/2009; Dispositive Motions due on or before 3/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/5/08. (jct)
October 3, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on or before October 13, 2008; and denying as moot 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/3/08. (bkp)
September 22, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, at this time, 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff may refile the Motion if Defendants do not timely or fully respond to his requests for production. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/22/08. (jct)
September 17, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to redocket 26 Plaintiff's Letter to the Court as "Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's August 26, 2008 Requests for Production". Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel within 11 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/17/08. (jct)
September 15, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant William Taylor, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint & Amended Complaint upon him, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Defendant Taylor's private address shall be redacted from the return of service & any other public portion of the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/15/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bersly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?