Donnelly et al v. Leafty et al

Plaintiff: Lisa A Donnelly and Richie Collazo
Defendant: Leonard Leafty and Western Flyer Express Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00100
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/8/2010. (jct)
August 6, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs counsel's oral request for an Order re: General Order 54. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/6/09. (jct)
June 18, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever & Try Separately Third-Party Claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/18/09. (jct)
May 5, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, based upon the Arkansas Supreme Court's decision that Ark. Code Ann. Section 16-55-202 is unconstitutional, granting 24 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Notice of Nonparty Fault. An Amended Scheduling Order will be issued. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/5/09. (jct)
March 23, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding in abeyance 24 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Notice of Nonparty Fault. The parties are to notify the Court of the Arkansas Supreme Court's decision w/i 10 days of its decision in Johnson v. Rockwell Automation, Inc., et al, Case No. 1:06CV00017. The trial date of 5/11/09 is continued & an Amended Scheduling Order will be issued once the Supreme Court has issued its opinion. The deadlines set forth in 23 Order are extended 45 days with the exception of pretrial discl osure sheets. Deadlines for pretrial disclosure sheets, trial briefs, jury instructions, motions in limine & stipulations will be set by the Amended Scheduling Order. (Discovery due by 5/15/2009, Motions due by 5/26/2009, Status Report due by 5/28/2009). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/09. (jct)
March 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Continue. The Court extends the following deadlines: Discovery due by 4/1/09; Motions due by 4/10/09; Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 4/17/09; Status Reports due by 4/13/09. The proffering party must designate the pertinent portions of an evidentiary deposition by 4/13/09. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/09. (jct)
February 9, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Third-Party Plaintiff Western Flyer Express, Inc.'s Motion for Default Judgment against Third-Party Defendant Manuel Irizarry, Administrator of the Estate of Manuel Irizarry. A hearing will be scheduled to determine the amount of Western Flyer Express, Inc.'s claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/9/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly et al v. Leafty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A Donnelly
Represented By: Robert M. McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richie Collazo
Represented By: Robert M. McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Leafty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Flyer Express Inc
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?