Dawes v. Cameron Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: James T Dawes
Defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00111
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/20/09. (jct)
November 13, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's telephone request to extend the Rule 26(f) conference. The parties are jointly responsible for holding a Rule 26(f) Conference on or before 12/1/2008. Any request to extend this deadline must be by written motion. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/13/08. (jct)
October 20, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/20/08. (jct)
October 15, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 MOTION to extend Rule 26(f) deadlines filed by James T Dawes. The parties are jointly responsible for holding their Rule 26(f) conference on or before 11/7/08 & a Rule 26(f) Report must be filed by 11/ 21/2008. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant has no obligation to respond to 18 Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, which are premature. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is directed to contact defense counsel within 10 days from the entry date of this Order & provide counsel a phone number where counsel can reach him. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/08. (jct)
September 12, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/12/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawes v. Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?