Joseph v. National Healthcare of Newport Inc

Plaintiff: Edward Joseph, Jr
Defendant: National Healthcare of Newport Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00137
Filed: August 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 29 Memorandum And Order entered this date, granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Edward Joseph, Jr.'s claims under the Age Discrimination in Employment Act, 29 U.S.C. Sections 621 et seq., & the Family and Medical Leave Act, 29 U.S.C. Sections 2601 et seq., & that Joseph's state law claim that his discharge was in violation of public policy be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/4/2010. (jct)
October 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, due to scheduling conflicts, the 10/19/09 trial of this matter is continued. A new trial date will be scheduled, if necessary, once the pending motion for summary judgment is ruled upon. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/9/09. (jct)
April 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Defendant's MOTION to Continue. Jury Trial rescheduled for week of 10/19/2009 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Discovery due by 8/24/2009, Motions due by 9/7/2009, Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 9/21/2009. All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/13/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. National Healthcare of Newport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Joseph, Jr
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Healthcare of Newport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?