Rees v. Jonesboro, City of et al

Plaintiff: David Rees
Defendant: Jonesboro, City of and Michael McQuay
Case Number: 3:2008cv00147
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's oral motion for voluntary dismissal, & his cause of action is hereby dismissed without prejudice; parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/2/2010. (jct)
August 21, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to Plaintiff's failure to comply with the show cause Order, Defendant Phillip Crego is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/21/09. (jct)
July 22, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff David Rees is directed to file a statement with the Court on or before 8/20/09 to show cause why Defendant Phillip Crego should not be dismissed from this lawsuit. Failure to comply with the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of Defendant Crego without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rees v. Jonesboro, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rees
Represented By: F. David Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McQuay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?