Stovall v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Charles Scott Stovall
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00175
Filed: November 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 26 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, directing the Commissioner to contact the Treasury Department to determine whether Plaintiff owes any debt to the Treasury Department's Offset Program as of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff owes any debt, the Commissioner shall pay the EAJA award to Plaintiff, deducting any offset owed. If Plaintiff does not owe a debt, the Commissioner shall make the EAJA award check payable directly to Plaintiff's attorney, Robert P. Young, & mail it to Mr. Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/30/2010. (jct)
November 3, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & expenses in the amount of $5,696.28. The Court requests that Plaintiff's counsel, w/i 21 days of date of entry of this Order, file a supplemental reply addressing whether a co ntract exists in which Plaintiff has assigned his rights to attorney fees to his counsel & attaching any such contract. Defendant's counsel shall have 21 days after Plaintiff's supplemental reply to file a supplemental response. Plaintiff 's counsel will have 14 days to file a second supplemental reply addressing any issues raised in the government's supplemental response. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to immediately provide Plaintiff with a copy of this Order & all pleadings filed by the parties in response to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/3/2010. (jct)
August 23, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, the decision of the Commissioner is reversed & this action is remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/23/2010. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)
October 6, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Plaintiff obtain service on Defendant w/i 30 days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/6/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stovall v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Scott Stovall
Represented By: Robert Patrick Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?