Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc v. Bower Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc
Defendant: Bower Services Inc
Counter Claimant: Bower Services Inc
Counter Defendant: Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00178
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Cornerstone's complaint. Bower Services's counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/2/2015. (jak)
February 22, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively terminating the case. Any party may move to reopen & dissolve the stay when & if the developing circircumstances support resuming active litigation in this Court. If no motion to reopen has been filed by 12/31/2014, the Court will reopen, dissolve the stay & dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2012. (jct)
December 10, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bower Recovery Specialists Inc. The case is stayed rather than dismissed; the request for protective order is moot. The Court orders Bower Recovery to file a notice providing the name & addres s of the trustee for Bower Services by 12/15/10. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a complete certified copy of the file in this case to the trustee by 12/22/10. The Court orders both parties to provide a joint status report to this Court every 60 days starting 3/1/2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/10/2010. (jct)
September 27, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Bower Recovery Specialists Inc must respond to Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc's requests for production of documents in accordance with this Order by 10/4/10. The Court awards attorney's fees in the amount of $300.00 relating to Cornerstone's having to file its successful motion to compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/2010. (jct)
August 17, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to Compel. The Bower Defendants must answer Cornerstone's written discovery requests in full by 8/27/10. The Court also orders the Bower Defendants to explain by 8/27/10 why Cornerstone is not entitled to a reasonable attorney's fee for having to move to compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2010. (jct)
April 2, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend Complaint to name an additional defendant; denying w/o prejudice 17 Parks Chevrolet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. The Court will permit Plaintiff 45 days from date of entry of this Order in which to conduct discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc v. Bower Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc
Represented By: Christopher Mark Jester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bower Services Inc
Represented By: Terry F. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bower Services Inc
Represented By: Terry F. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cornerstone Wrecker Sales Inc
Represented By: Christopher Mark Jester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?