Johnson v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: David Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00187
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:206 Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses; denying 23 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded $2,120.96 in attorney's fees & expenses under the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/4/2011. (jct)
October 18, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Court's 9/27/10 26 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses is VACATED and SET ASIDE. The Commissioner shall file a Supplemental Response w/i 21 days of the entry of this Order. Mr. Bartels may file a Supplementa l Reply w/i 14 days of the filing of the Supplemental Response. Mr. Bartels must mail a copy of this Order (including Exhibit A) to Plaintiff & promptly file a Notice with the Court confirming the mailing. If Plaintiff wishes to contest the validity of his assignment of his right to EAJA attorney's fees to his attorney, he must file a Response w/i 21 days of the date of this Order setting forth the basis for his objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/18/2010. (jct)
September 27, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses; denying 23 Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded $2,120.96 in attorney's fees & expenses under the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/27/2010. (jct)
March 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 16 Memorandum and Order entered this date, the decision of the Commissioner is reversed & this action is remanded as a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/22/2010. (jct) (copy forwarded to ALJ and H&A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?