Bedford v. Flash Market Inc

Plaintiff: Theressa Bedford
Defendant: Flash Market Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00192
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement; granting 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/2010. (jct)
February 23, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 MOTION & 16 Amended MOTION to Continue. ( Jury Trial is rescheduled for week of 1/3/2011 at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Discovery deadline is extended to 8/2/2010; Motions due by 9/6/2010; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 12/6/2010). All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/2010. (jct)
December 3, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential discovery in this cause of action; granting 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/09. (jct)
July 30, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Joint MOTION to Continue. (Discovery due by 2/22/2010, Motions due by 3/8/2010, Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/22/2010; jury trial rescheduled for week of 4/19/2010 at 1:30 p.m. in Jonesboro) All other deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/30/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedford v. Flash Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theressa Bedford
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?