Rhodes v. Arkansas State University

Plaintiff: Pamela Rhodes
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Case Number: 3:2008cv00194
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Arkansas State University against Pamela Rhodes, pursuant to 47 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment entered this date. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/11/2010. (jct)
September 15, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to provide responses to the outstanding discovery by 10/1/09. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, her case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute as set out in Fed.R.Civ.P.41. Rhodes is cautioned that dismissal of her case, even though without prejudice, will likely bar her Title VII claims due to the applicable statutory time limitations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/15/09. (jct)
February 9, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay. The Court, in its discretion, quashes 14 service made in this matter upon ASU's Human Resources office. The U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas is directed to deliver copies of the summons & complaint to the Chief Executive Officer for Arkansas State University in accordance with Rule 4(j)(2). Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/9/09. (jct)
December 1, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pamela Rhodes, directing plaintiff to file a supplemental application addressing the deficiencies specified within 20 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/1/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Arkansas State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?