Chaffin v. Eichert et al

Plaintiff: Cristina Renee Chaffin
Defendant: Stephen J Eichert, Medical Assurance Company Inc and John Doe
Cross_claimant: Medical Assurance Company Inc
Cross_defendant: Stephen J Eichert
Case Number: 3:2009cv00002
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 180 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/8/2011. (jct)
July 21, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to Jury Verdict, in favor of Stephen J. Eichert & Medical Assurance Company Inc. against Cristina Renee Chaffin. The complaint of Cristina Renee Chaffin is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/2011. (jct)
July 15, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Jury Trial reset for 7/18/2011 at 01:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/11. (kpr)
June 16, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Michael N. Watts & Edward R. McNees to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, between 7/18/11 & 7/21/11, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/16/2011. (jct)
June 15, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Linda Clark to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, between 7/18/11 & 7/21/11, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/2011. (jct)
May 24, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 to begin at 9:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes. Counsel should be present thirty minutes prior to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/2011. (jct)
January 27, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 131 Dr. Eichert's Motion objecting to certain of Chaffin's deposition designations; denying 145 Dr. Eichert's Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting 150 & [156 ] Medical Assurance Company Inc's Motions to adopt motions filed by Dr. Eichert. In the future, a motion for joinder should not be filed but only a statement saying that it adopts by reference the motion & arguments of Dr. Eichert, & the Court will consider the motion as having been jointly made by both Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/2011. (jct)
December 21, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Jury Trial rescheduled for 7/18/2011 at 10:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Counsel are to be present 30 minutes prior to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/21/2010. (jct)
December 15, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling ( Jury Trial for 1/11/2011 at 10:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/2010. (jct)
December 14, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to a medical emergency involving a juror on 12/13/10 when this matter proceeded to trial, plaintiff moved for a mistrial & defendants agreed it was appropriate. Therefore, the Court ordered a mistrial. A new trial date will be scheduled by separate order. All evidentiary rulings made by the court before & on the day of trial will continue in effect when the new trial date is set. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2010. (jct)
December 9, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Michael N. Watts & Edward R. McNees to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, between 12/13/10 & 12/17/10, during the trial of this matter, subject to the stated provisions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/2010. (jct)
December 6, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Linda J. Clark to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, between 12/13/10 & 12/17/10 during the trial of this action, subject to the stated provisions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/6/2010. (jct)
October 22, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( Jury Trial set for 12/13/2010 is rescheduled to begin at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Counsel should be present thirty minutes prior to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/22/2010. (jct)
February 24, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 104 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2010. (jct)
February 11, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 MOTION for Reconsideration re 110 Order on Motion to Continue. The 5/3/10 jury trial is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/11/2010. (jct)
January 20, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Jury Trial rescheduled for week of 5/3/2010 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes). Please note Amended General Order No. 54 regarding electronic devices. The discovery & motions deadlines have previously passed. Motions in limine must be filed on or before 4/19/10. Jury instructions should be submitted electronically to the Court by 4/26/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2010. (jct)
December 29, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must provide to the Defendants a medical records authorization permitting the Defendants to obtain her pharmacy records, as well as any medical records from a medical care provider who prescribed pain medication for the plaintiff dating back to the year 2000. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/29/09. (jct)
December 9, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 First Motion in Limine filed by The Medical Assurance Company Inc. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/09. (jct)
November 24, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Joint Motion for Second Amended Final Scheduling Order. (Discovery due by 12/31/2009; Motions, except for motions in limine, due by 1/10/2010). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/24/09. (jct)
April 23, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Extend Time to comply with expert designation requirements; granting 66 Motion to join motion for extension of time. The deadline to comply with the expert designation requirements is extended to & including 4/30/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/09. (jct)
April 16, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 & 61 Motions to Extend Time for expert designations. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/16/09. (jct)
February 9, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Medical Assurance Company's Motion for Joinder; denying 31 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/9/09. (jct)
January 6, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that the Defts' request that this case be transferred to the Jonesboro Division is GRANTED, but their motions to dismiss are DENIED 19 20 ; (NEW CASE NUMBER is 3:09-cv-00002). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaffin v. Eichert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Renee Chaffin
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Germany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Eichert
Represented By: Rick T. Beard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Assurance Company Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Medical Assurance Company Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Stephen J Eichert
Represented By: Rick T. Beard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?