Sullivan & Associates LLC v. Prince et al

Plaintiff: Sullivan & Associates LLC
Defendant: Gary Prince, Bryan Kidd and Sara Kidd
Case Number: 3:2009cv00009
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/2010. (jct)
January 20, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Plaintiff owns a valid copyright in the Tranquility Plan 1429. Defendant Prince had "access" to the copyrighted material. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/20/2010. (jct)
October 14, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as it appears that the issues have been resolved. Plaintiff's request for attorneys fees is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/14/09. (jct)
July 22, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, having been notified that a settlement has been reached between Plaintiff Thomas Marshall Sullivan & Separate Defendants Bryan & Sara Kidd, the complaint against Bryan & Sara Kidd is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Pursuant to 19 Notice of Dismissal of Crossclaim filed by Gary Prince, the crossclaim against Bryan & Sara Kidd is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan & Associates LLC v. Prince et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sullivan & Associates LLC
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?