Goodman v. Hartford Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Barry Goodman
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company, St Mary's Episcopal School Group Disability Plan and St Mary's Episcopal School
Case Number: 3:2009cv00011
Filed: February 3, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, St Mary's Episcopal School, St Mary's Episcopal School Group Disability Plan against Barry Goodman, pursuant to 25 Order & 31 Order. Defendants are entitled to $2,016.00 for overpayment, plus interest at the rate of 0.36% from November 12, 2009, until paid. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/5/2010. (jct)
November 12, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 25 Order entered this date granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/12/09. (jct)
March 19, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 7 Answer & Counterclaim, directing the Clerk to correctly identify Hartford Life Insurance Company as Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Mary A. Johnson at Direction of the Court on 3/19/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Hartford Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Goodman
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Mary's Episcopal School Group Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Mary's Episcopal School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?