Lowery v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: JoeAn Lowery
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv00013
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 & 36 Motion for Attorney's Fees & Costs. Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees & costs in the total amount of $9,287.60. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/29/2010. (jct)
March 9, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs. If Plaintiff wants the attorney's fees considered, she should file a renewed motion by 5:00 p.m., 3/12/10. Plaintiff should include in her renewed motion the amount of fees or costs she is requesting, as well as a detailed description of how the fees or costs were incurred. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/9/2010. (jct)
December 11, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of JoeAn Lowery against Unum Life Insurance Company of America re 26 Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/11/09. (mkf)
July 30, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is directed to file any motion for summary judgment & brie f in support by 5:00 p.m., 8/10/09. All pleadings must comply with the Local Rules. Defendant is directed to file any response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by 5:00 p.m., 10/9/09. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/30/09. (jct)
July 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/14/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoeAn Lowery
Represented By: R. Theodor Stricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?