Chappell v. Bilco Company

Plaintiff: Johnny Chappell
Defendant: Bilco Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00016
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:825 The Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Bilco Company against Johnny Chappell, pursuant to 61 Opinion and Order entered this date. The complaint of Johnny Chappell is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/2011. (jct)
November 9, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Motions. (Motions deadline extended up to & including 11/12/2010). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/9/2010. (jct)
January 12, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended & substituted complaint in which all allegations that were resolved in the previous lawsuit between the parties are omitted. If Plaintiff wishes to continue this lawsuit, this amended & substituted compla int must be filed w/i 20 days of this Order & served upon Defendant's counsel. The case, now set for trial on 1/26/10, will be reset in due course, assuming Plaintiff files the amended & substituted complaint. Defendant's 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment & 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/12/2010. (jct)
February 10, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Arkansas, Jonesboro Division. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/10/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Bilco Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Chappell
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilco Company
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?