Quinn v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Paulette Quinn
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, TRW Automotive Safety Systems Arkansas Inc and John Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00026
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 82 Order entered this date, all Quinn's claims against TRW Safety Systems, Inc., TRW Automotive Safety Systems Arkansas, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., & John Does 4-10 are dismissed without prejudice. All Quinn's claims against Ford & Jaguar are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlement, with the Court retaining jurisdiction unil 4/30/2012 over that settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/2012. (jct)
July 19, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline. Quinn must identify her experts & provide their opinions by 7/22/11. All other deadlines remain unchanged. As to Autoliv, the record is now clear that this company ha d nothing to do with the seatbelts or the pretensioners & the Court dismisses all claims against Autoliv without prejudice. Autoliv's 68 MOTION to Extend Time to file a late answer is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2011. (jct)
July 6, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER governing the production and protection of documents produced by Autoliv which it considers confidential and proprietary; granting 66 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Autoliv ASP Inc. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/2011. (mkf)
June 8, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Joint MOTION to Continue and for Extension of Discovery. A revised final scheduling order & new trial setting will issue in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Quinn
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: D. Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive Safety Systems Arkansas Inc
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?