Smith v. Marine Terminals of Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Billy D Smith
Defendant: Marine Terminals of Arkansas Inc and Kinder Morgan River Terminals LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00027
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice pursuant to settlement. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/2011. (jct)
August 9, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 MOTION to Determine Medicare Set Aside, & setting forth the ordered provisions per the stated conclusions of law. The case is hereby re-closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2011. (jct)
August 3, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case, & this case is hereby reopened. Motion 67 to determine Medicare set aside amount remains pending before this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/2011. (jct)
March 3, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/3/2011. (jct)
February 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; Discovery due by 3/23/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/11. (vjt)
January 25, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Intervene filed by American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/25/2011. (jct)
December 17, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Defendant's MOTION to Continue Trial. The settlement conference scheduled for 12/21/10 will be recheduled by Magistrate Judge H. David Young. The Court will also reschedule the trial & issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/17/2010. (jct)
November 17, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Marine Terminals' Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted on Smith's Jones Act claim, unseaworthiness claim, & maintenance and cure claim, but denied on Smith's section 905(b) claim. Smith's motion for leave to file a supplemental response 38 is moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/2010. (jct)
July 13, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defendant's MOTION to Continue; the 9/20/10 trial is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/13/2010. (jct)
July 15, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party. Kinder Morgan River Terminals, LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Marine Terminals of Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D Smith
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Terminals of Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan River Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?