Hanson v. Craighead County Detention Center et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00032
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 46 Order of Dismissal entered this date, this case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to Plaintiff's failure to timely & properly comply with the Court's 7/21/09 Order. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/24/09. (jct)
July 21, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a (freeworld) Amended Application to Proceed w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order with a Statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/21/09. (jct)
June 26, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Discovery due by 9/21/2009, Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/26/09. (mkf)
June 9, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 29 Answer, the Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet to reflect that Defendant Jack McCain is "Jack McCann". Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/9/09. (jct)
June 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Accordingly, Defendant Jerry Sparks is voluntarily DISMISSED, without prejudice, from this action. Further, the Court certifies, based on 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/1/09. (jct)
May 14, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons for Defendants Aaron Davis, John Smith, Jack McCain, Alfreda Hampton & Jeremy Sparks. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint 1 , Amended Complaint 9 & Second Amended Complaint 10 upon them without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/14/09. (jct)
May 1, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 9 Amended Complaint naming "Jerry Sparks" as a Defendant & 10 Second Amended Complaint naming "Jeremy Sparks" as a Defendant. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, w/i 11 days of entry of this Order, a Statement clarifying whether this is the same individual and, if so, which is his correct name. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/1/09. (jct)
April 27, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Based on the screening function mandated by 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A, Defendant Craighead County Detentio n Center is DISMISSED, with prejudice, because it is not amenable to suit in a Section 1983 action. Plaintiff may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendant Steven Metcalf. The Court further certifies, based on 28 U.S.C. Secti on 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to issue summons for Defendant Metcalf, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve Defendant Metcalf without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/27/09. (jct)
March 18, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, to either: (1) pay the $350 filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, along with a properly completed prisoner calculation sheet. Plaintiff is reminded that his failure to timely & properly comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/18/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?