Ward v. Craighead County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Sandra K Ward
Defendant: Craighead County Jail and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00041
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 54 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, this case is dismissed with prejudice & the relief sought is denied. Further, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), it is hereby certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order & Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous & not in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/14/2010. (jct)
August 24, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Plaintiff's Response, which the Court is treating as a motion to amend & GRANTS said Motion, and directing the Clerk to add Jack McCann, Jeremy Sparks, and Arron Davis as Defendants. Service is appropriate on Defendants McCann, Sparks & Davis, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve said Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/24/09. (jct) Modified on 8/24/2009 to correct Deft Davis' name (jct).
May 15, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations 6 ; dismissing the Craighead County Jail and the inmate; and referring the case back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/15/09. (bkp)
April 8, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted 1 . This dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 USC 1915(g). The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/8/2009. (lej)
March 30, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, either the $350 statutory filing fee, or to complete & sign an in forma pauperis application, & submit it to the Court, along with an inmate trust fund calculation sheet & certificate signed by an authorized official. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of her complaint. Service is not appropriate for Defendants at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/30/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Craighead County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?